Accounts and annual returns THE ST. MARY NEWINGTON UNITED PAROCHIAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1079735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 November 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 February 2020 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required