Financial history THE ST. MARY NEWINGTON UNITED PAROCHIAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1079735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.50k £7.02k £7.23k £7.42k £6.17k
Total expenditure £2.00k £5.12k £2.42k £9.00k £7.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A