COVENT GARDEN DRAGON HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1087268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 August 2016 On time Download