MYOKE TRUST

Charity number: 1081031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Christian Church - for the promotion of Missions based on Biblical values

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £66,945
Total expenditure: £62,153

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolton
  • Bury
  • Manchester City
  • Oldham
  • Rochdale
  • Salford City
  • Stockport
  • Tameside
  • Trafford
  • Wigan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 June 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FARNWORTH CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHNSON DANIEL-SAM Chair 06 June 2000
SPRING OF HOPE UK LIMITED
Received: On time
NEW LIFE COMMUNITY CHURCH
Received: On time
KINGS PARK CHRISTIAN CENTRE
Received: On time
Hudsen Charles Daniel-Sam Trustee 22 January 2022
None on record
ANDREW CHARLES TONGE Trustee
KINGS PARK CHRISTIAN CENTRE
Received: On time
PAUL MORRIS Trustee
KINGS PARK CHRISTIAN CENTRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £67.73k £58.26k £49.59k £66.97k £66.94k
Total expenditure £85.23k £69.56k £67.72k £67.46k £62.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
61 PLODDER LANE
FARNWORTH
BOLTON
BL4 0BX
Phone:
07842941122
Website:

fcf.org.uk