THE FIRS ASSOCIATION, SALE
Charity number: 1080702
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising Activities. School Discos, Summer Fairs, Christmas Fairs, Cake Sales
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2012
Total income: £5,382
Total expenditure: £5,076
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
- Trafford
Governance
Registration history:
- 12 May 2000: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 September 2009: Standard registration
- 09 February 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 May 2013: Re-registered
- 09 February 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.90k | £2.75k | £1.69k | £6.13k | £5.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.72k | £4.51k | £922 | £6.87k | £5.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 29 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 29 May 2013 | 333 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window