Financial history THE HASLEMERE FUND

Charity number: 1109323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.89k £5.36k £7.22k £5.48k £6.33k
Total expenditure £2.77k £18.31k £4.27k £4.51k £5.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A