VICTIM SUPPORT COUNTY DURHAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Victim Support is the independant national charity which helps people cope with crime. We offer free confidential support and advice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 24 January 2002: Standard registration
- 27 November 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 27 November 2009: Funds transferred to 298028 VICTIM SUPPORT
- VSCD (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/01/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £436.50k | £481.33k | £377.60k | £267.60k | £256.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £481.46k | £428.94k | £359.32k | £332.16k | £330.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2008 | 19 January 2009 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2008 | 19 January 2009 | 50 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 26 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 06 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 15 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 23 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 23 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 29 September 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 9 NOVEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE VICTIMS OR WITNESSES OF CRIME AND PERSONS AFFECTED BY CRIME WITHIN THE COUNTY OF DURHAM AND THE BOROUGH OF DARLINGTON INCLUDING THE FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED. B) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND AWARENESS BY RESEARCH INTO ISSUES RELATING TO THE VICTIMS AND WITNESSES OF CRIME AND THEIR FAMILIES AND FRIENDS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. B) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND AWARENESS BY RESEARCH INTO ISSUES RELATING TO THE VICTIMS AND WITNESSES OF CRIME AND THEIR FAMILIES AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
COUNTY DURHAM BOROUGH OF DARLINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window