HANSLOPE 326 CLUB

Charity number: 1079967
Charity reporting is up to date (127 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Hanslope After School Clubs provides after school and holiday care to children from primary school foundation year up to 12 years old, in a safe, stimulating environment. The latest Ofsted rating was Good. Through professional tutors, we also provide a wide range of after school activities such as Pottery, Football and Gym.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £117,557
Total expenditure: £104,400

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Milton Keynes

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HANSLOPE AFTER SCHOOL CLUB (Working name)
  • HANSLOPE AFTER SCHOOL CLUBS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Georgina Tunnicliffe-King Chair 09 January 2018
None on record
Danielle Cotte-Wick Trustee 14 October 2023
None on record
Jennifer Swift Trustee 14 October 2023
MILTON KEYNES YMCA LIMITED
Received: On time
Zoe Snelling Trustee 14 October 2023
None on record
Caroline Hodgkinson Trustee 14 October 2023
None on record
Victoria Taylor Trustee 12 October 2022
None on record
Scott Pardoe Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
ANNE TERESA GAMBLES Trustee 14 March 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £108.24k £73.76k £73.76k £74.95k £117.56k
Total expenditure £106.16k £87.36k £87.36k £89.57k £104.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.01k £11.19k £4.30k £12.35k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 November 2024 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 04 November 2024 127 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 September 2024 455 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 27 September 2024 455 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 July 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 05 July 2022 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 04 July 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 July 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 July 2020 4 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
39 WESTERN DRIVE
HANSLOPE
MILTON KEYNES
MK19 7LB
Phone:
01908510709
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available