FRIENDS OF CHIDDINGFOLD SURGERY

Charity number: 1080617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Goudie Trustee 28 January 2015 None on record
Barrie Raymond Sidney Pople Trustee 28 January 2016 None on record
SANDRA GILBERT Trustee 28 January 2016 None on record
NIGEL SOUTHON Trustee 30 April 2020
WOODLARKS CAMP SITE TRUST Received: On time
Andrea Wright Trustee 30 April 2020 None on record
Dr CLAIRE JEANETTE WILLETT Trustee None on record
Simon Ralph Elliot Inchbald Chair 05 November 2015 None on record
Dr DARREN PAUL WATTS Trustee None on record
LYNNE HAMILL Trustee None on record
CREIGHTON THOMAS REDMAN Trustee None on record
Dr CLAIRE LOUISE SHORTER Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record