Financial history SAHARA (COVENTRY) LTD

Charity number: 1086900
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.94k £19.28k £15.20k £20.79k £28.64k
Total expenditure £3.54k £36.46k £24.83k £22.61k £21.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A