SOMEWHERE TO GO LIMITED

Charity Number: 1080963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To relieve poverty and distress among the most disadvantaged in the community, by providing a space where people can feel welcome and comfortable and create an environment which will enhance self worth & self esteem. To offer nourishing food, clothing; to facilitate access to medical & welfare services; help with housing and benefits.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £402,520
Total expenditure: £202,325

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • North Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 May 2000: Standard registration
  • 06 October 2022: Funds received from 1081265 COMFORT AND WARMTH
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daniel Heley Chair 01 March 2021
None on record
Sian Wilmot Trustee 18 November 2024
None on record
Andrew Scott Mr Trustee 11 October 2024
None on record
Tracey Louise Parker Trustee 08 January 2024
None on record
Daniel Aldridge Trustee 04 December 2023
None on record
Catherine Gibbons Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Mary Veronica Usher-Clark Trustee 04 September 2019
None on record
Kevin Speller Trustee 14 April 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £295.53k £167.42k £127.85k £264.69k £402.52k
Total expenditure £253.09k £149.68k £146.44k £170.95k £202.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £75.00k £40.55k £25.31k £60.00k £199.46k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 23 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 23 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 12 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 12 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 31 May 2023 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 31 May 2023 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 14 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 03 June 2022 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 02 November 2021 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 02 November 2021 216 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Somewhere to GO
4a Boulevard
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
BS23 1NA
Phone:
01934 641880