RURAL ARTS NORTH YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 1081007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LAURA TURNER Trustee 03 September 2020 None on record
Sarah Corden Lloyd Trustee 15 February 2018 None on record
ANNA KELNER Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record
OLIVER O'SHEA Trustee 29 July 2021 None on record
RUTH MIDDLETON Trustee 29 July 2021 None on record
Gaye Kirby Trustee 06 June 2019 None on record
SARAH DENNISON Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record