Financial history OXFORD PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA TRUST

Charity number: 1084256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.52m £1.74m £2.06m £1.37m £1.06m
Total expenditure £1.63m £1.58m £1.91m £1.38m £1.04m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.03k £3.00k £3.00k £3.00k £313.60k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.01m £1.23m £1.54m £1.05m £687.68k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £508.43k £512.25k £525.48k £322.24k £62.03k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £119 £0 £121 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £313.60k
Income - Legacies £97.47k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.63m £1.58m £1.91m £1.38m £1.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.64k £9.80k £8.09k £7.80k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0