Trustees OXFORD PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA TRUST

Charity number: 1084256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Sir Andrew John Pollard Trustee 05 October 2021
None on record
Bianca Jagger Trustee 01 August 2021
THE BIANCA JAGGER HUMAN RIGHTS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Alfiya Askar Abulkhair Trustee 01 August 2021
None on record
Rasha Khawaja Trustee 01 August 2021
None on record
Dr Louis Russell Hirshfield Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
Lord Anthony William Hall CBE Trustee 01 January 2021
PAUL HAMLYN FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Sir Ivor Anthony Roberts KCMG Trustee 08 June 2020
KEATS - SHELLEY MEMORIAL ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: 15 days late
Marco Assetto Trustee 30 November 2018
None on record
Sir Jonathan Phillips Trustee 22 November 2018
KEBLE COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Received: On time
THE OXFORD BACH CHOIR SUPPORT TRUST
Received: On time
THE KEBLE ASSOCIATION ICW OXFORD UNIVERSITY
Received: On time
ESMEE FAIRBAIRN FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DR MARIOS PAPADOPOULOS MBE Trustee 09 December 2015
None on record
GEOFFREY JOHN DE JAGER Trustee 24 April 2011
OXFORD FESTIVAL OF THE ARTS
Received: On time
THE TOWNSHIP INITIATIVE
Received: On time
RHODES UNIVERSITY TRUST (UK)
Received: On time
SAPHIE ASHTIANY Trustee 24 April 2011
None on record
DAVID HAENLEIN Trustee 04 November 2004
None on record
RAYMOND BLANC OBE Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR MICHAEL JOHN EARL Trustee
None on record