THE LOWE SYNDROME TRUST

Charity number: 1081241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 02 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 02 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 06 July 2020 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 06 July 2020 67 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 01 May 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 01 May 2019 1 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 09 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 23 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 March 2017 On time Download