ALTERNATIVE LINKS FOR TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1084707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 06/04/2016 06/04/2017 06/04/2018 06/04/2019 06/04/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.00k £1.46k £1.80k £120 £150
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A