Trustees DERBY EAST SCOUT DISTRICT
Charity number: 1081505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE TATTERSALL | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WOOD | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
EMILY CHATER | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN GILES | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOSHUA BESTWICK | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kitty Chater | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Tatersall | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
TIM BODDY | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE RILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON GILES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.