THE WESTENDERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity runs a community centre known as The Westenders Hall. Due to the Coronavirus pandemic, this year no productions were made and as a result no income was raised, with the exception of room hire. The money outstanding from the 2020 pantomime was paid in June 2020.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Powys
Governance
- 19 October 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE DAVID CHARLES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Timothy Ross Short | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Thompson | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Roger Smith | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Manley | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brydie Alexandra Jones | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Ashton | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diana Gail Altmeyer | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kristina Fiona Barker | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN GLENN BRADSHAW | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PAUL BOWEN | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Paul Dean Cole | Trustee | 28 May 2010 |
|
|
||||
JULIE HELEN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA MARGARET JANE WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHELLE DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.84k | £21.78k | £2.75k | £37.85k | £60.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.32k | £7.11k | £7.54k | £31.39k | £46.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.00k | N/A | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JULY 1998 AS AMENDED 19 SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BRECON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
BRECON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Camden Crescent
BRECON
Powys
LD3 7BY
- Phone:
- 01874623507
- Email:
- p.ashton305@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window