Financial history LIEUTENANT COLONEL COHEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1082471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £107.39k £138.20k £130.05k £82.25k £137.84k
Total expenditure £122.11k £92.15k £78.30k £158.90k £220.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A