FRIENDS OF ST OSWALDS, GRASMERE

Charity number: 1081080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 18 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 576 days
Annual return 30 June 2018 27 September 2019 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 02 September 2017 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required