Trustees BLACKPOOL POLAR BEARS
Charity number: 1082638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW FINLAYSON | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANN ELIZABETH FOSTER | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
EMMA INGLIS | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Joyce | Trustee | 09 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Ann Crook | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shantelle Christie | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Morrison | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
DONNA HOLLAMBY | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|||||
LYNDA INGLIS | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.