HEYDOUR PARISH MILLENNIUM GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Millennium village green is an environmental asset for the village
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 October 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 22 June 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Evans | Chair | 15 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Simon Jones | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Elizabeth Lavinia Evans | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JOHN HILL OBE | Trustee | 12 March 2000 |
|
|||||
NIGEL RICHARD WILD | Trustee | 12 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ROBERT BROMIGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS CATHY SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/10/2020 | 18/10/2021 | 18/10/2022 | 18/10/2023 | 18/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £512 | £3.24k | £1.54k | £1.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.22k | £2.39k | £1.38k | £1.76k | £1.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 October 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 October 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 October 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 October 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 October 2020 | 13 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM TO THE PROVISION OF THE PROPERTY AND SHALL ACCORDINGLY HOLD ANY PROPERTY TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS 'HEYDOUR PARISH MILLENNIUM GREEN' FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND TO BE USED FOREVER AS AN AREA FOR INFORMAL RECREATION PLAY OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS; A MEETING AREA OR PLACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR ANY OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE CONSISTENT WITH THESE TRUSTS AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 VILLAGE STREET
OASBY
GRANTHAM
LINCOLNSHIRE
NG32 3NB
- Phone:
- 07845856857
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window