LUTON FRIENDSHIP HOMECARERS

Charity number: 1081256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £827.35k £971.06k £1.00m £974.79k £953.68k
Total expenditure £788.76k £916.37k £950.27k £961.24k £934.31k
Income from government contracts £21.17k £81.46k £50.94k £36.12k £37.04k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £827.25k £971.04k £1.00m £974.55k £953.46k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £96 £20 £73 £247 £224
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £788.76k £916.37k £950.27k £961.24k £932.42k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.50k £2.45k £2.45k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.90k