WOODCOTE CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1080742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 April 2017 On time Download