WOODCOTE CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1080742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £64.99k £71.44k £60.72k £67.98k £509
Total expenditure £65.42k £72.38k £61.12k £63.85k £1.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A