TRINITY HOUSE COMMUNITY RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity number: 1082054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £199.66k £600.36k £238.65k £262.90k £239.76k
Total expenditure £222.54k £245.76k £290.49k £291.89k £313.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £15.20k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £61.20k £55.28k £34.30k £47.00k £47.55k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £223 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £43.96k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £555.20k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £368 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £606 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £244.90k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £854 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A