Trustees THE KATHERINE LOW SETTLEMENT LIMITED
Charity number: 1081248

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Jane Rycroft Huddart | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Cerise-Celine Prince | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sarah Swash | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Martin Alcock | Trustee | 05 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Abigail Margaret Cable | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mr Ben Thomas | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
THE REVD CANON SIMON BUTLER | Trustee | 27 September 2012 |
|
|||||||||||
GEOFF THOMAS | Trustee | 26 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.