Accounts and annual returns BOROUGH MUSIC SCHOOL

Charity number: 1081779
Charity reporting is overdue by 1329 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 598 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 598 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 963 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 963 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1329 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1329 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 October 2019 243 days late Download Open in new window