IBAD AR-RAHMAN WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping the Poor, Disabled, Orphans, Widows and the Disadvantaged people of Pakistan and Azad Kashmir, by providing them with financial support, education, food and subsistence. providing services to the local communties in Luton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Luton
- Pakistan
Governance
- 11 January 2001: Standard registration
- IBAD AR-RAHMAN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUMTAZ AHMED | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MEHERBAN KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IBRAR SHAFI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.95k | £56.91k | £45.29k | £48.68k | £73.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.52k | £39.36k | £47.85k | £40.72k | £53.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 March 2023 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 August 2022 | 186 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 August 2022 | 186 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT, FOOD AND ASSISTANCE TO POOR, DISABLED, ORPHANS, WIDOWS AND THE DISADVANTAGED TO ASSIST POOR GIRLS OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH WHO WISH TO MARRY WITH A SUM OF MONEY AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES TO THE CHILDREN OF POOR PEOPLE BY MEETING THEIR FINANCIAL NEEDS FOR ENROLMENT FEES AND STATIONERY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
226 SELBOURNE ROAD
LUTON
LU4 8LU
- Phone:
- 07956616597
- Email:
- i_arrahman@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window