FRIENDS OF COTHERSTONE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Cotherstone School raises money for use by Cotherstone Primary School, facilitates a good relationship between the school and the local community and supports the school in any way deemed helpful.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Durham
Governance
- 10 May 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelly-Marie Green | Chair | 12 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Evangeline Louise Lynda Bark | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Elizabeth Hobson | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Emma Atkinson | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Emma-Jane Hindle | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Rowena Elliot Carr | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.73k | £2.26k | £726 | £6.57k | £5.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.81k | £1.97k | £1.83k | £5.97k | £4.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 10 January 2021 | 224 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 APRIL 2000 as amended on 11 Mar 2022 as amended on 17 Jun 2022 as amended on 11 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
2. PURPOSES The object of the association (the objects) is to advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by: 2.1 Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school 2.2 Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
COTHERSTONE PRIMARY SCHOOL
COTHERSTONE
BARNARD CASTLE
DL12 9QB
- Phone:
- 01388213397
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window