Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL HOUSE OF PRAYER LONDON - IHOPLONDON

Charity number: 1084270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 May 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 May 2024 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 May 2024 557 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 May 2024 922 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1350 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1350 days