ST. MARY'S CONVENT AND NURSING HOME (CHISWICK)

Charity number: 1080751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.17m £3.19m £3.53m £3.91m £4.04m
Total expenditure £2.95m £3.01m £3.34m £3.41m £3.67m
Income from government contracts £121.12k £136.00k £169.00k £245.72k £189.96k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £397.85k £198.24k £191.19k £367.82k £240.26k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £25.00k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.69m £2.88m £3.19m £3.36m £3.59m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £64.21k £84.39k £100.85k £113.57k £121.21k
Income - Other £23.39k £23.97k £17.84k £61.19k £86.34k
Income - Legacies £164.63k £24.95k £37.00k £0 £25.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.95m £3.00m £3.33m £3.40m £3.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.72k £7.25k £8.03k £7.92k £8.11k
Expenditure - Governance £10.80k £11.22k £11.58k £0 £10.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £6.72k £7.25k £8.03k £7.92k £8.11k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0