Financial history T. & J. MEYER FAMILY FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1087507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £416.92k £589.58k £658.61k £433.93k £395.94k
Total expenditure £851.85k £1.25m £1.27m £1.42m £1.34m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £230.98k £658.61k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £358.59k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.25m £1.14m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £131.41k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £15.20k £23.86k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £729.77k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £131.41k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A