Financial history ARLEY STROKE CLUB

Charity number: 1085390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.00k £6.83k £6.81k £12.62k £660
Total expenditure £8.00k £8.79k £7.76k £9.47k £781
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A