THE WHEELS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide the AQA unit award scheme in three fields, basic car/motorcycle maintenance, construction and hair & beauty to disadvantaged children aged between 12 and 18yrs. The students, will gain recognized certificates/qualifications to take them further with their future.We also incorporate life skills and team building within these units, again to give the students a good start to their future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 21 December 2000: Standard registration
- WHEELS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN RICE | Chair | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Ridley | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Danny Richardson | Trustee | 18 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Bushell Chris | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Merton | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Sawyer Dicky | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.87k | £72.87k | £138.60k | £131.98k | £187.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.81k | £76.81k | £124.44k | £129.73k | £170.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 FEBRUARY 1999 AS AMENDED ON 4 DECEMBER 2000 AND 19 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED ON 09 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE WHEELS PROJECT ARE: A)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF LESS ACADEMICALLY MINDED YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING HANDS ON TRAINING IN MOTOR VEHICLE, MOTORCYCLE MAINTENANCE AND CONSTRUCTION (PAINTING AND DECORATING, JOINERY, ELECTRICS, PLUMBING AND BRICK LAYING). B)TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, LIFE SKILLS AND TRAINING WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. C)THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF TEAM WORK TO FOSTER AN UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH TYNESIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 4
Prince Consort Industrial Estate
HEBBURN
NE31 1EH
- Phone:
- 01914839483
- Email:
- info@wheelsproject.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window