Financial history ABERGWESYN COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1082047
Charity reporting is overdue by 1628 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/04/2012 20/04/2013 20/04/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £2.30k £1.76k £1.73k £2.05k £1.47k
Total expenditure £1.26k £1.96k £1.12k £642 £1.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A