SUNDERLAND SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur Symphony Orchestra. It aims to provide public concerts, charity music provision, and consultation to other music groups. (Minimum age 16).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Durham
- Sunderland
Governance
- 15 September 2000: Standard registration
- COSMOS (Working name)
- CITY OF SUNDERLAND MILLENNIUM ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY (COSMOS). (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerard McCormack | Chair | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Helen Louise Baxter | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN A LENNOX | Trustee | 16 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE DAKERS | Trustee | 21 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY JOY LOWTHER | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN NAISBY | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARK GREENFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WINIFRED ELLEN LUNDGREN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER CHAPMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.32k | £15.72k | £5.50k | £12.85k | £13.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.16k | £13.28k | £5.20k | £12.59k | £10.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED 17 JULY 2000, 21 MARCH 2001, 05 MARCH 2003 AND 09 MARCH 2005 AND 08 MARCH 2006 AND 26 MAY 2010. as amended on 28 Mar 2018 as amended on 27 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS, THE PROVISION OF TUITION, THE MAINTENANCE OF AN ORCHESTRA AND BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE SOCIETY, THROUGH IT'S TRUSTEES, SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 17 Nile Street
SUNDERLAND
SR1 1EY
- Phone:
- 07968964076
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window