Financial history RACING WELFARE

Charity number: 1084042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.83m £2.90m £3.93m £5.36m £4.67m
Total expenditure £2.67m £3.22m £3.82m £3.70m £4.42m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £5.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £801.00k £1.12m £2.07m £3.91m £2.57m
Income - Other trading activities £584.00k £565.70k £659.03k £323.90k £960.31k
Income - Charitable activities £12.00k £627.85k £645.00k £832.77k £904.80k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £432.00k £579.64k £552.34k £237.03k £226.13k
Income - Other £0 £3.68k £3.50k £47.07k £3.50k
Income - Legacies £20.00k £9.40k £12.00k £269.00k £330.05k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.33m £2.78m £3.30m £3.31m £3.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £342.00k £443.15k £518.12k £398.56k £761.68k
Expenditure - Governance £73.00k £82.72k £18.96k £66.51k £57.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £104.00k £0 £0 £127.61k £150.50k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0