Trustees RACING WELFARE
Charity number: 1084042

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas McLeod-Clarke | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Olivia Broderick | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colonel William Toby Browne | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hope | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Lady Celina Imogen Carter | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN LANCELOT EDDIS | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Venetia Wrigley | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|||||
ROD STREET | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CHARLES FARQUHAR | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAM MARSHALL BARLOW | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|||||
MORAG GRAHAM GRAY | Trustee | 26 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK JAMES RUSSELL | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.