SKIPTON AND CRAVEN ACTION FOR DISABILITY

Charity number: 1092511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 02 May 2017 On time Download