LATIN AMERICAN SOCIAL FUND 2000 PLUS

Charity number: 1099504
Charity reporting is overdue by 228 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 228 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 228 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 February 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 July 2019 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 May 2017 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required