EQUALITIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes equality and diversity by providing advocacy and support to those who may suffer discrimination, particularly from black minority ethnic sections of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income includes £23,083 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 September 2005: Standard registration
- 25 February 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ENC (Working name)
- EQUALITIES NATIONAL COUNCIL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.11k | £42.29k | £35.67k | £58.22k | £58.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.20k | £63.39k | £47.23k | £71.09k | £71.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £16.31k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.73k | £0 | £33.27k | £23.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 16 July 2019 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2018
(These accounts |
16 July 2019 | 166 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 JULY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY ELIMINATING DISCRIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF POVERTY, RACE, NATIONALITY, DISABILITY OR ETHNIC ORIGIN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOREGOING BY: (A) PROVIDING ADVOCACY AND OTHER ASSISTANCE OR SUPPORT TO PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE LIKELY TO SUFFER DISCRIMINATION (B) PROMOTING EQUAL ACCESS TO SERVICES TO SUCH PERSONS DESCRIBED ABOVE (C) THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH FOR SUCH PERSONS DESCRIBED ABOVE (D) RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF CHRONICALLY SICK AND DISABLED PERSONS, PARTICULARLY FROM BLACK MINORITY ETHNIC (BME) SECTIONS OF THE COMMUNITY, AND THEIR CARERS RAISING AWARENESS OF AND UNDERSTANDING OF CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF DISCRIMINATIONN
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window