Financial history BOSNIA & HERZEGOVINA COMMUNITY ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 1085815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £125.74k £161.40k £127.90k £245.95k £140.49k
Total expenditure £117.32k £157.83k £140.88k £143.18k £133.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £20.01k £19.90k £55.31k £44.31k