THE RUSLAND VALLEY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1085846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £2.17k £3.71k £3.63k £3.00k £3.10k
Total expenditure £2.55k £2.16k £1.85k £2.12k £2.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A