Accounts and annual returns BISHOP MASCALL CENTRE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1084326
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 November 2022 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 February 2021 96 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window