Accounts and annual returns BARTON (RICHMONDSHIRE) PLAYING-FIELD LIMITED

Charity number: 1086922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 26 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 09 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 09 April 2021 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 09 April 2021 679 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1737 days