FASHION AWARENESS DIRECT

Charity number: 1112095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 05 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 05 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time Download