FASHION AWARENESS DIRECT

Charity number: 1112095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £137.49k £180.49k £170.30k £135.60k £50.65k
Total expenditure £149.34k £189.74k £167.04k £168.19k £93.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A