Financial history JUBILEE SAILING TRUST (TENACIOUS) LIMITED

Charity number: 1081658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.97m £2.83m £2.14m £1.98m £2.18m
Total expenditure £2.29m £2.83m £2.14m £1.98m £2.18m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.98m £2.04m £538 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £28.93k £14.17k £10.78k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £961.36k £776.34k £650.74k £583.31k £667.24k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £1.48m £1.39m £1.52m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.03m £2.62m £1.92m £1.73m £2.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £235.78k £208.67k £218.16k £178.95k £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £39.05k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £17.70k £8.52k £0 £67.08k £0