Financial history BOSENCE FARM COMMUNITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1088236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.39m £1.45m £1.54m £1.82m £1.88m
Total expenditure £1.45m £1.57m £1.53m £1.70m £1.77m
Income from government contracts £1.28m £1.21m £1.39m £1.13m £1.13m
Income from government grants £15.83k £17.16k N/A £458.82k £366.61k
Income - Donations and legacies £106.91k £138.16k £71.39k £642.46k £453.50k
Income - Other trading activities £152 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.28m £1.30m £1.46m £1.17m £1.43m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.79k £3.68k £4.25k £3.30k £1.97k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £880 £0
Income - Legacies £40.51k £0 £0 £22.07k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.45m £1.57m £1.53m £1.70m £1.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £44.54k £18.88k £20.20k £19.63k £19.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £671 £0 £0 £0 £0